Multiplications Tricks

Posted by  Colscol   in       8 months ago     144 Views     Leave your thoughts  

Tricki Tip 01: MULTIPLICATION OF ANY TWO NUMBERS, LIES BETWEEN 11 AND 19

12*17 = (12+7)*10 + (2*7) = 190 + 14 = 204
Explanation: Add first number and last digit of the second number put zero in the third place of this number then multiply of last digit of the two numbers and add into it .

Example:  14*13 = (14+3)*10 + (4*3) = 170 + 12 = 182


Tricki Tip 02: MULTIPLICATION OF WITH 11 WITH ANY 3 DIGIT NUMBER.

341*11 = 3—(3+4)—(4+1)—1 = 3751
Explanation: Insert the sum of first and second digits, then sum of second and third digits between the two terminal digits of the number

Example:

A)432*11 = 4—(4+3)—(3+2)—2 = 4752

Explanation: If sum of two digits of the number is greater than 10, then add 1 to previous digit and subtract 10 to the associated digit.

B) 789*11 = 7—(7+8)—(8+9)—9
7+1–(5)+1—(7)—9
8679


http://www.m4maths.com/maths-trick-1-Multiplication-of-any-two-numbers,-lies-between-11-and-19.html

http://www.m4maths.com/maths-trick-1-Multiplication-of-any-two-numbers,-lies-between-11-and-19.html

http://www.m4maths.com/maths-trick-1-Multiplication-of-any-two-numbers,-lies-between-11-and-19.html

Yoo(0)Boo(0)

About  

Colscol Galactic